judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00801-CR
14-81-00801-CR
11/18/1981
Auto Theft
Williams, Odis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
09/22/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/09/1982No description available.DENIED
08/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/08/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/11/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
11/18/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
11/18/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
336,498
18 yrs.