Case Information: 84-CV-0105 | |||
Short Caption: | BEE JONES, PHINIS | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 02/10/1984 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/10/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/06/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/06/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/19/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Appellant | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BEE JONES, PHINIS | |||
01/01/1906 | BERGERJ GR WASH BRD OF TRADE CHRISTIANJ GR WASH BRD OF TRADE | |||
02/10/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/06/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/06/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/19/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/24/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |