judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00421-CV
04-81-00421-CV
11/13/1981
Plea of Privilege
Wilson, Richard and Central Power and Light Co.
Carillo, Irma Garcia
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/1983Mandate Issued
12/13/1983Mandate Issued
10/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
10/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
02/22/1983Submission
02/22/1983Submission
02/22/1983Submitted
03/01/1982Case ready to be set
03/01/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/01/1982Case ready to be set
01/15/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/29/1981Brief Filed
12/04/1981Brief Filed
11/16/1981No Description Available.
11/13/1981No Description Available.
11/13/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 6
Bexar
Honorable Ruben Garcia
132,679
n/a