Case: 14-95-00148-CR
14-95-00148-CR
02/06/1995
HABEAS CORPUS
Figueroa, Rafael Angel (WHC)
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/17/1996 | Case stored | | |
12/17/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
12/17/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/17/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/02/1996 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
12/02/1996 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
11/15/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
11/15/1996 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
10/31/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
10/31/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
10/31/1995 | Submitted | | |
10/31/1995 | Submission | | |
10/31/1995 | Submitted | | |
09/29/1995 | Submission | | |
09/07/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/07/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/07/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/07/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/01/1995 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
09/01/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/13/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
06/15/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/15/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/07/1995 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
06/07/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/24/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
03/23/1995 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/23/1995 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
03/15/1995 | Exhibits received | | |
03/15/1995 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
03/15/1995 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
02/13/1995 | Record due | | |
02/13/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
02/13/1995 | Supplemental transcript DUE | | |
02/10/1995 | No description available. | | |
02/10/1995 | Transcript FILED | | |
02/06/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/27/1995 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
01/18/1995 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/13/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
12/17/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John Harrity, III Brian Marcus Middleton |
FIGUEROA, RAFAEL ANGEL | Criminal - Appellant | Frank Alvarez |
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable THOMAS RALPH CULVER
25,023 HC.#I