judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00268-CR
08-81-00268-CR
11/16/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Smith, Austin Hal
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
09/16/1983Mandate Issued
08/19/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
07/15/1983Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
04/27/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/22/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
03/23/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/10/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
01/05/1982Brief Filed
01/05/1982Record filed.
01/04/1982Brief Filed
12/02/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
34993-168
15 yrs.