judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00664-CV
05-89-00664-CV
06/05/1989
Contract
Rental Associates and Third Party Administrators, Inc.
Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/23/1997Record RetentionDestroy
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
10/03/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/03/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
09/27/1989Response to Motion
09/18/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/09/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/31/1989Letter Filed
07/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/10/1989Letter Sent by the Court
06/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/19/1989MattConv
06/05/1989Transcript Filed
06/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/04/1989Appeal Bond Filed
02/07/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
87-15991-A