judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0794-89
PD-0794-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
PITTS, MARK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PITTS, MARKApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bill Loveless
STATE OF TEXASStateBruce Isaacks
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00152-CR
Aff 4-20-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
158th District Court
Denton
Honorable PHILLIP VICK
F88-84-B