Case: 04-98-00591-CR
04-98-00591-CR
07/02/1998
Other Felony
Jose Mario Guerra
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1998 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
12/08/1998 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
12/03/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/03/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/23/1998 | Submitted | | |
09/23/1998 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/23/1998 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/23/1998 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/23/1998 | Submission | | |
09/23/1998 | Submitted | | |
09/08/1998 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/08/1998 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed | | |
07/31/1998 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
07/29/1998 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
07/29/1998 | Clerks Record Received | | |
07/27/1998 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
07/15/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
07/02/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/02/1998 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
07/02/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/26/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/27/1998 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/03/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Trial Judge, 341St District Ct | INTERESTED PARTY | Honorable Elma T. Salinas Ender |
Court Reporter, 341St District | INTERESTED PARTY | Ana Laura Alcantar |
Jose Mario Guerra | Criminal - Appellant | J. Eduardo Pena |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Isidro R. Alaniz |
Trial Court Information
341st Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Elma T. Salinas Ender
97-CRS-214-D3
15 Years & $500 Fine.