judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00193-CV
08-89-00193-CV
06/05/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Texas Cab Company
Giles, Joe Nathan
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/27/1990Shuck purged
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
01/18/1990Fee paid
01/08/1990Fee paid
12/27/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/27/1989Payment of fee due requested
12/27/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/08/1989Submitted
12/08/1989Submission
12/08/1989Submitted
12/06/1989Filed waiver of oral argument
12/04/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/01/1989Motion to supplement filed
10/31/1989Submission
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/01/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/16/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
08/04/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/05/1989Brief Filed
06/12/1989Fee paid
06/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/05/1989Payment of fee due requested
06/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/05/1989Transcript Filed
06/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Michael L. Aaronson
UnknownAppellantHon. Antonio Cortez
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
El Paso
88-6232