Case: 97-0188
97-0188
03/06/1997
See former TRAP 130(D)
THE ESTATE OF ELVA MAE CHAMBERS JACKIE LOU PROPST individually and as representative of the ESTATE OF ELVA MAE CHAMBERS deceased JACKIE LOU PROPST individually
DR. ROY KINGRY DR. DAVID GEORGE DR. PETER SANFELIPPO DR. DAVID R. SHAFER and DR. KYLE JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/29/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | on behalf of Dr. Kyle James | |
09/02/1997 | Brief received | Petitioner | 12 copies of COA brief (Appellant's Brief) | |
09/02/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/02/1997 | Reply to Response | Respondent | on behalf of Dr. Roy Kingry, Dr. David George, Dr. Peter Sanfelippo, & Dr. Dav id R. Shafer | |
04/21/1997 | Reply to Response | Respondent | on behalf of Dr. Kyle James | |
04/15/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/14/1997 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
09/29/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply to mo/re ($10.00); to Kay Ellington check #09991 for $20.00 returned | | |
09/29/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | on behalf of Dr. Kyle James | | |
09/25/1997 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | rehearing overruled | |
09/22/1997 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | mo/re due 09-02-97 | |
09/22/1997 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office filed 09-02-97 pursuant to granting of m/e/t to file | | |
09/02/1997 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | filed pro se on behalf of Jackie Lou Propst | | |
09/02/1997 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
09/02/1997 | Brief received | 12 copies of COA brief (Appellant's Brief) | | |
09/02/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
09/02/1997 | Motion for rehearing received | postmark attached to original | | |
09/02/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | m/e/t to file mo/re & Mo/Re (total of $20.00); to Jackie Lou Propst | | |
07/31/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
05/07/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/02/1997 | Reply to Response | on behalf of Dr. Roy Kingry, Dr. David George, Dr. Peter Sanfelippo, & Dr. Dav id R. Shafer | | |
04/21/1997 | Reply to Response | on behalf of Dr. Kyle James | | |
04/15/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
03/10/1997 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | due 03-14-97 | | |
03/10/1997 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | app due 03-14-97 | |
03/06/1997 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/14/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 28B3 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
UNIVERSITY OF TX. HEALTH CENTE | Respondent | Mr. Douglas R. McSwane Jr. |
Propst, Jackie Lou | Petitioner | Jackie Lou Propst Honorable Stephen Goetzmann |
SANFELIPPO, PETER | Respondent | Mr. Michael E. Starr |
SHAFER, DAVID R. | Respondent | Mr. Michael E. Starr |
JAMES, KYLE | Respondent | Ms. Kay E. Ellington |
ESTATE OF ELVA MAE CHAMBERS | Petitioner | Honorable Stephen Goetzmann |
GEORGE, DAVID | Respondent | Mr. Michael E. Starr |
KINGRY, ROY | Respondent | Mr. Michael E. Starr |
TYLER S. | Respondent | Mr. Joel J. Steed |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-95-00055-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 12-30-96
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable CHARLES HOLCOMB
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Smith
Honorable Justice Diane DeVasto
94-971-E