Case: 97-0185
97-0185
03/06/1997
App Writ of Error
EARLE COBB JR.
THOMAS M. THURMOND and JOHN E. CLARK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/13/1997 | Brief on the Merits | Other than Petitioner, Respondent, Relator etc. | filed at US District Court: "Response of the State of Texas to Earle Cobb, Jr. petition/application for writ of habeas corpus, motion that ..." | |
10/10/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | Mo/Re of Contempt Order | |
09/22/1997 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | and objections to recommendations made by the Honorable Judge Frank Montalvo | |
05/08/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | | |
05/05/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/06/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/23/1999 | Documents filed; see remarks | from Valerie R. Esparza, copy of order denying implicit request for cert of apealabitlity signed by Judge Biery, and letters to Earle Cobb, Jr.. | | |
04/14/1998 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
12/01/1997 | Documents filed; see remarks | USDC order denying as moot petitioner's amended motion for new trial (Rule 59) and for declaratory judgment | | |
11/03/1997 | Documents filed; see remarks | filed in USDC SA 97 CA 1249; "Response of State of Texas to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of habeas corpus" | | |
11/03/1997 | Documents filed; see remarks | Order from USDC Judge Fred Biery, dismissing application for writ of habeas corpus | | |
10/22/1997 | Documents filed; see remarks | service copy from US District Court "Motion for leave to file first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus" O + 1 | | |
10/13/1997 | Brief on the Merits | filed at US District Court: "Response of the State of Texas to Earle Cobb, Jr. petition/application for writ of habeas corpus, motion that ..." | | |
10/13/1997 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | petitioner's motion for rehearing of contempt order is overruled | |
10/10/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Mo/Re of Contempt Order | | |
10/10/1997 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
10/08/1997 | Letter Received | transmitting fee and proof of service of motion | | |
10/07/1997 | Order received from another court - see remarks | copy of order on writ of habeas corpus issued by USDC Judge Fred Biery | | |
10/06/1997 | Letter Received | fax copy of article from San Antonio Express-News | | |
10/03/1997 | Miscellaneous Motion | "motion for release on own recognizance and hearing before assigned judge on charge of contempt" | | |
10/03/1997 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | motion for release on own recognizance ... is overruled | |
10/03/1997 | Letter Received | letter transmitting copies of two checks to J. Clark and C. Thurmond | | |
10/03/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | for motion for release on own recognizance ... | | |
10/02/1997 | Capias issued to command person to custody | capias issued to command petitioner to custody of Bexar County Sheriff | | |
10/02/1997 | Order of Contempt | judgment of contempt and order to issue capias is issued | | |
09/22/1997 | Response to Petition | and objections to recommendations made by the Honorable Judge Frank Montalvo | | |
09/17/1997 | Letter Filed | from Edward P. Cano, attorney form petitioner on motion for contemp RE: findings of fact Original only | | |
09/17/1997 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | from petitioner's atty, Edward Cano; response to Judge Montalvo's recommen- dations; due by 10:00 a.m., 09/22/97 | | |
09/11/1997 | Order from Lower Court filed | findings of fact/conclusions of law from the Hon. Frank Montalvo, 225th Dist. Court, Bexar County, TX | | |
09/11/1997 | Transcript filed | show cause hearing 08/07/97 & 08/11/97; Hon. Frank Montalvo; 225th District Court of Bexar County, Texas (original only) | | |
07/23/1997 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | motion granted in part | "respondents' motion to require immediate compliance/to require pet. to show cause why he should not be held in contempt" is granted in part. Order issued | |
07/23/1997 | Order of the Court Issued | appointing the Hon. Frank Montalvo, 288th TC, Bexar County, to conduct a show cause hearing on whether petitioner should be held in contempt of Supreme Ct. | | |
07/16/1997 | Call received | from John Clark; he will be on vacation for one week | | |
07/11/1997 | Letter Received | Letter from E. Cobbadvising this Court that he will join resp in his request for a show cause hearing. (copy fwd. to chambers) | | |
07/10/1997 | Letter Received | from E. Cobb, refusing to pay sanctions until an order is signed by "duly qualified judge" | | |
07/03/1997 | Motion for Contempt | "Motion to Require Immediate Compliance with Previous Order & To Require Pet t o Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held In Contempt of Court" | | |
07/02/1997 | Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks | returning leter and check for $1000.00 to petitioner | | |
06/27/1997 | Letter Filed | O + 4 | | |
06/26/1997 | Letter Filed | petitioner's failure to comply with the court's order of April 18, 1997. | | |
06/12/1997 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | Justice Spector not sitting | |
05/21/1997 | Letter Filed | RE: non-payment of damages as sanctions | | |
05/08/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
05/05/1997 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
05/05/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
05/05/1997 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
05/05/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10.00 fee for mo/re not paid letter sent to Earle Cobb, Jr. | | |
04/23/1997 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | corrected sanctions order sent to all parties | | |
04/18/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied with notation. | with the following notation: "Writ Denied." Order assessing sanctions of $1000.00 against petitioner. (Justice Spector not sitting) | |
04/18/1997 | Order of the Court Issued | Order imposing sanctions of $1000.00 against petitioner for frivolous appeal. (Justice Spector not sitting) | | |
03/26/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/06/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/14/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 15-B-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
EARLE COBB, JR. | Petitioner | Mr. Earle Cobb Jr. |
THURMOND, THOMAS M. | Respondent | Mr. Harry Skeins Jr. |
CLARK, JOHN E. | Respondent | Mr. John E. Clark Mr. Harry Skeins Jr. |
COBB, JR., EARLE | Petitioner | Mr. Edward P. Cano |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-95-00687-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 12-18-96
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable CATHERINE STONE
Trial Court Information
225th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Frank Montalvo
85-CI-13906