judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00542-CR
01-89-00542-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Esteves, Eric Victor
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/17/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/29/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/29/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/24/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
03/18/1992Writ disposedRefused
01/28/1992Case file received by higher Court or agency.
01/27/1992Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
01/10/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/12/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/12/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1991Submitted
11/19/1991Submission
11/19/1991Submitted
10/14/1991Submission
08/08/1991Order entered
07/19/1991Supplemental brief filed
07/11/1991Supplemental brief filed
06/28/1991Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
06/28/1991Case ready to be set
06/28/1991Case ready to be set
06/06/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/23/1991Motion to extend time to file sup brief dispMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
05/22/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/13/1991Motion to extend time to file sup brief
04/25/1991Motion to exceed page length of brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
04/24/1991Brief filed
04/12/1991Motion to exceed page length of brief filed
04/04/1991Motion to exceed page length of brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/26/1991Motion to exceed page length of brief filed
01/31/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/22/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/30/1990Motion to obtain record (generally pro se)
10/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/11/1990Order enteredOverruled
10/03/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/17/1990Statement of facts filedOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
08/14/1990Objection to record
07/20/1990Letter of inquiry received, usually from an inmate.
03/01/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
02/06/1990Submission
01/23/1990Motion to substitute counsel
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Waiver
11/15/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/17/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/15/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/31/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/20/1989Statement of facts filed
07/20/1989Transcript filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/24/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
05/24/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. Leslie Brock
StateCriminal - AppellantEric Victor Esteves
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantBen Levy
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
Honorable WOODY RAY DENSEN
526310(4cts)
Life