Case: 05-94-00888-CR
05-94-00888-CR
06/03/1994
Possession of Cocaine
Hernandez, Jose DeJesus
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/04/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/04/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/21/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Disposed | Withdrawn | |
07/21/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Disposed | Withdrawn | |
07/20/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/15/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed | | |
07/11/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
07/11/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney | | |
06/27/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
06/03/1994 | Notice Sent | | |
06/03/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/25/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/28/1994 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/04/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F93-66553-RJ
10 yrs TDC Prob