Case: 05-94-00877-CR
05-94-00877-CR
06/03/1994
Possession of Cocaine
Tatum, Cedric Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/26/1995 | Case stored | | |
01/26/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/26/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/18/1995 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
11/18/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Disposed | Withdrawn | |
11/18/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Disposed | Withdrawn | |
06/24/1994 | Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed | | |
06/03/1994 | Notice Sent | | |
06/03/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/19/1994 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
05/19/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/26/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable E. Paul Banner
F92-67375-MU
15 yrs TDC