Case: 02-94-00125-CV
02-94-00125-CV
06/03/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Denton County, Texas
Miller, Barbara
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/17/2008 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
04/30/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/21/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
02/09/1996 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/29/1995 | Writ Filed | | |
10/26/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
10/05/1995 | Response Filed | | |
09/25/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
09/07/1995 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/06/1995 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed | | |
08/24/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/07/1995 | Submitted | | |
02/07/1995 | Submission | | |
02/06/1995 | Order Entered | | |
01/30/1995 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
12/09/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
12/09/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/13/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
08/03/1994 | Exhibits Filed | | |
08/03/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
08/03/1994 | Submission | | |
07/20/1994 | Submission | | |
07/20/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
06/09/1994 | Letter | | |
06/08/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/06/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
06/03/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
06/03/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2008 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Denton County, Texas | Appellant | James P. Allison David C. Payne |
Miller, Barbara | Appellee | William E. Trantham |
Trial Court Information
158th District Court
Denton
Honorable Phillip O. Vick
89-3064-158