Case: 08-00-00078-CV
08-00-00078-CV
02/08/2000
Miscellaneous civil
Feria, Julia/The Dynagraphics Company, Inc., d/b/a The Dynagraphics Group, and Adolphus Andrews, Jr., and Frances A. Dillingham, d/b/a Andrews-Dillingham Properties
The Dynagraphics Company, Inc. d/b/a The Dynagraphics Group, and Adolphus Andrews, Jr. and Frances A. Dillingham d/b/a Andrews-Dillingham Properties/Julia Feria
No
5th Court of Appeals
02/08/2000
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/2004 | Permanent Withdrawal of Exhibits | | |||
11/02/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/23/2004 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
05/05/2004 | Received notice that Petition for Review was filed in Supreme Court. | | |||
04/30/2004 | Received notice that Petition for Review was filed in Supreme Court. | | |||
03/30/2004 | Publisher's List of Attorneys | | |||
03/15/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
04/18/2001 | Submitted | | |||
04/18/2001 | Submission | | |||
04/18/2001 | Submitted | | |||
03/09/2001 | Submission | | |||
07/03/2000 | Fee paid | | |||
06/28/2000 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||
06/26/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/26/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/26/2000 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/14/2000 | Fee paid | | |||
06/14/2000 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |||
06/14/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |||
06/12/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |||
06/12/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |||
05/31/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/31/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |||
05/30/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/25/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/25/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/25/2000 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
05/25/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/24/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/24/2000 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
05/08/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/08/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/03/2000 | Fee paid | | |||
05/03/2000 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/03/2000 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
04/11/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/11/2000 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
04/10/2000 | Appendix to Brief Filed | | |||
04/10/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/10/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/10/2000 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
04/10/2000 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
03/20/2000 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
03/15/2000 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
03/09/2000 | Fee paid | | |||
03/09/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |||
03/07/2000 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/06/2000 | Fee paid | | |||
03/06/2000 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/06/2000 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
03/01/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/01/2000 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
03/01/2000 | Order entered | | |||
03/01/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |||
02/22/2000 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
02/16/2000 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
02/08/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
02/08/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
02/07/2000 | No description available. | | |||
01/31/2000 | No description available. | | |||
01/29/2000 | Record due | | |||
01/28/2000 | Miscellaneous Letter Filed | | |||
01/28/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |||
01/19/2000 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||
01/12/2000 | $125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
01/12/2000 | No description available. | | |||
01/12/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/12/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/05/2000 | No description available. | | |||
12/29/1999 | $125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
12/29/1999 | No description available. | | |||
12/29/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/29/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
11/30/1999 | No description available. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/02/2004 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FERIA, JULIA | Appellant | Hon. Greg Gray Hon. Ted B. Lyon, Jr. |
THE DYNAGRAPHICS COMPANY, INC. | Appellee | Hon. Linda G. Moore |
ADOLPHUS ANDREWS, JR., ET AL. | Appellee | Hon. O. Luke Davis, III |
Trial Court Information
160th District Court
Dallas
Honorable David C. Godbey
96-13048-H