judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00543-CR
01-89-00543-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Baize, Andrew Berry
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/15/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/19/1990Writ disposedRefused
07/10/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
07/05/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/20/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/04/1990Date final opinion release for publication
05/31/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/11/1990Motion for rehearing filed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/26/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
12/28/1989Supplemental brief filed
12/15/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/20/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/25/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/20/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/31/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
08/31/1989Transcript filed
08/25/1989Statement of facts filed
08/14/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript
08/03/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/24/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Notice of appeal filed
05/26/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasShane Phelps
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. C. Jack Maner
StateCriminal - State of TexasCharles A. Rosenthal, Jr.
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable LLOYD DOUGLAS SHAVER
523156
15 years TDC $10,000