judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00545-CR
01-89-00545-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Kutka, Stephen Matthew
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/18/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/14/1989No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/14/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/29/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
06/29/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
06/07/1989Motion to withdraw appeal
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Notice of appeal filed
05/26/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantBruce Campbell Zivley
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable LLOYD DOUGLAS SHAVER
523157
5 years TDC $10,000