judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00659-CR
05-89-00659-CR
06/02/1989
Other Drug Possession
Allen, Michael Todd
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2019Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/21/1990Mandate Issued
05/21/1990Mandate Issued
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/19/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Letter Sent by the Court
12/15/1989Brief Filed
12/07/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/22/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/11/1989Transcript Filed
07/25/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
07/24/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/21/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F89-80247-MI
25 yrs TDC