Case: 04-98-00583-CR
04-98-00583-CR
07/01/1998
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Jose Luis Romero
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/08/1999 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
07/02/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/02/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/07/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/07/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/07/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/07/1999 | Submission | | |
04/07/1999 | Submitted | | |
03/05/1999 | Submission | | |
03/03/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/19/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
02/19/1999 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
02/19/1999 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
02/19/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/19/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/16/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
01/06/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/30/1998 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/30/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
11/30/1998 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
10/07/1998 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
10/06/1998 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
10/06/1998 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/05/1998 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/02/1998 | Motion Filed | | |
09/11/1998 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/11/1998 | Exhibits Filed | | |
09/11/1998 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
08/10/1998 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
08/05/1998 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
07/20/1998 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/20/1998 | Order Entered | | |
07/09/1998 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
07/09/1998 | Clerks Record Received | | |
07/05/1998 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
07/01/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/01/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/29/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/17/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
03/20/1998 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/02/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jose Luis Romero | Criminal - Appellant | Carl S. Lobitz |
Court Reporter | INTERESTED PARTY | |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel Thornberry |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
97-CR-2738
45 Years.