judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0798-89
PD-0798-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
BARTH, JOHN DAVID
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/29/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/13/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Barth, John DavidApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John David Barth
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00268-CR
Aff 4-24-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 6
Dallas
Honorable Berlaind Brashear
MB85-19444-G