Case: 14-94-00547-CV
14-94-00547-CV
06/01/1994
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Castillo, Juan Jesus
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/25/1995 | Case stored | | |
07/14/1994 | Opinion issued | GRANTED | |
07/14/1994 | Order Entered | | |
07/14/1994 | Opinion issued | GRANTED | |
06/29/1994 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
06/29/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/29/1994 | Submission | | |
06/29/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/07/1994 | Original writ returned from sheriffs office following service | | |
06/02/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file habeas corpus DISPOSED - REL, RES | GRANTED | |
06/02/1994 | Order Entered | | |
06/01/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file habeas corpus FILED - REL, RES | | |
06/01/1994 | Petit.writ of habeas corpus RECEIVED-REL,RES | | |
06/01/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Hon. Israel B. Garcia, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Relator | Hon. George Nino |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Relator | Hon. Juan V. Silva |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Judge, 245th District Court |
Trial Court Information
245th District Court
Harris
Honorable HENRY G. SCHUBLE
93-61059