Case: 10-97-00191-CR
10-97-00191-CR
06/16/1997
Other Felony
Douglas James Carter
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/11/1998 | Case stored | | |
05/11/1998 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
04/23/1998 | Case returned from higher court | | |
04/01/1998 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
01/27/1998 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
01/22/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review filed | | |
12/23/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/03/1997 | Submitted | | |
12/03/1997 | Submission | | |
11/10/1997 | Submission | | |
10/03/1997 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
10/03/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/17/1997 | Motion for Oral Argument | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/15/1997 | Motion for Oral Argument | | |
09/10/1997 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/08/1997 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
08/14/1997 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
07/15/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
07/07/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
06/16/1997 | Notice of Appeal filed | | |
06/16/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/11/2023 | Case Stored | Destroy case in 25 years. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | Patrick C. Batchelor Damara H. Watkins |
Carter, Douglas James | Appellant | Henry Campbell, Iii |
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
Honorable John H. Jackson
26,468
2 yrs.; 10,000 fine