judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00123-CV
02-89-00123-CV
06/02/1989
Divorce
Wayland, Robert H.
Wayland, Laura G.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/14/1990Mandate Issued
03/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1989Submitted
11/02/1989Submission
09/28/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Brief Filed
08/30/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/18/1989Submission
07/18/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/30/1989No Description Available.
06/30/1989No Description Available.
06/30/1989No Description Available.
06/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/14/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
88492-C