judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00539-CR
01-89-00539-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Hill, Wayne Brian
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/14/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/30/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/03/1990Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
08/27/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
08/23/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
07/27/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
07/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Submission
01/05/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/05/1990Case ready to be set
01/05/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/30/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/14/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/20/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/31/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/21/1989Statement of facts filed
07/21/1989Transcript filed
06/02/1989Notice of appeal filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/25/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasLinda West
StateCriminal - AppellantFrancisco G. Medina
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames R. Buchanan
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantWayne Brian Hill
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
498132
Life in TDC