Case: 12-94-00157-CR
12-94-00157-CR
06/06/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Dominguez, Martin Cordova
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/28/1995 | Case stored | | |
09/27/1995 | | ||
09/15/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/30/1995 | | ||
08/15/1995 | | ||
07/31/1995 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
07/31/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/10/1995 | | ||
06/27/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/27/1995 | Submission | | |
06/23/1995 | Letter from the Court | | |
05/17/1995 | Submission | | |
10/21/1994 | | ||
10/14/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
10/14/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/12/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/12/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
09/08/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/15/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
07/29/1994 | | ||
06/27/1994 | Motion or Writ Granted | | |
06/27/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
06/24/1994 | motion for extension of time to file sfacts | | |
06/06/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
06/06/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/17/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/28/1994 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |
02/25/1994 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/15/1995 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
09/28/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dominquez, Martin Cordova | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Donald F. Killingsworth |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Edward J. Marty |
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
4-93-1012
50 yrs TDC & $5,000 fine