judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWNWELL VS. SWANSON

Case Information: 34653
Short Caption:BROWNWELL VS. SWANSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9902035Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Evans, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bible Hoy & Trachok--check no. 21162.
08/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07443
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret Springgate Evans. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-11167
12/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-11976
02/03/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-01761
02/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-02597
02/22/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties filed on February 18, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[We disapprove as moot the stipulation filed by the parties on February 3, 2000.] SNP/CLK 00-02769
02/22/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.