judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00657-CV
05-89-00657-CV
06/02/1989
Mandamus
Cigna Insurance Company
Hon. John Marshall, Judge, 14th District Court, Dallas Co.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/24/1997Record RetentionDestroy
06/29/1989Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/29/1989Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1989Transcript Filed
06/14/1989Affidavit Filed
06/14/1989MattConv
06/14/1989Response to Motion
06/05/1989Affidavit Filed
06/05/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1989Affidavit Filed
06/02/1989MattConv
06/02/1989Motion for Leave to File
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
88-10517-A