judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00267-CR
04-89-00267-CR
06/02/1989
Burglary
Soria, Jesus Gonzales
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
04/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/28/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/26/1990Waives Oral Argument
03/26/1990Submitted
03/26/1990Waives Oral Argument
03/26/1990Submission
03/26/1990Submitted
02/08/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/22/1990Submission
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/10/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/16/1989Brief Filed
10/03/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/01/1989No Description Available.
07/06/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/30/1989No Description Available.
06/26/1989No Description Available.
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/17/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/04/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
06/22/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
89-cr-1074
10 years TDC