Case: 05-00-00218-CV
05-00-00218-CV
02/09/2000
Divorce
Robert James Blanque, Sr.
Terri Jean Menard Blanque
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/11/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/11/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/02/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
05/02/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
05/02/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
05/01/2000 | Submission | | |||
05/01/2000 | Submitted | | |||
04/27/2000 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
04/20/2000 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
04/19/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
04/19/2000 | Motion Received | | |||
04/19/2000 | Notice Filed | | |||
04/19/2000 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/06/2000 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |||
04/06/2000 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
03/22/2000 | Record due | | |||
02/25/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
02/25/2000 | Notice Filed | | |||
02/22/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
02/11/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
02/11/2000 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/09/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/13/1999 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
11/23/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/05/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
05/01/2006 | Status | Destroy record |
07/11/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Theresa Shaw | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 301st District Court |
Terri Jean Menard Blanque | Appellee | Roberto David Benavides |
Robert James Blanque, Sr. | Appellant | Robert T. O`donnell |
Trial Court Information
301st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 301st District Court
DF99-12890