Case: 13-00-00088-CR
13-00-00088-CR
02/09/2000
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Felix DeLeon a/k/a Ruben Becerra DeLeon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/25/2005 | Record sent to storage | | |||
04/04/2002 | Record checked in | | |||
03/11/2002 | Green card in | | |||
03/01/2002 | Order Entered | | |||
03/01/2002 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
03/01/2002 | MOTION WITHDRAW _________ DISP. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/18/2002 | Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed | | |||
02/05/2001 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
01/26/2001 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |||
12/15/2000 | notice filed | | |||
12/13/2000 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
12/06/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/28/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/28/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/08/2000 | Motion Filed | | |||
09/08/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/31/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/31/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
08/30/2000 | Submitted | | |||
08/10/2000 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |||
08/10/2000 | Submission | | |||
05/25/2000 | Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/25/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Carried with the case | | ||
05/18/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/18/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/18/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/18/2000 | No oral argument requested | | |||
05/18/2000 | Brief received. | | |||
05/18/2000 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |||
05/18/2000 | Motion to withdraw as counsel | | |||
05/05/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/24/2000 | 10 day letter sent | | |||
03/24/2000 | docketing statement received | | |||
03/20/2000 | Notice was filed | | |||
03/13/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/06/2000 | Designation of Attorney | | |||
02/25/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
02/25/2000 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
02/25/2000 | Reporter's Record Received | | |||
02/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/09/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/06/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Josh McCown Hon. Robinson C. Ramsey Ana Lisa Garza |
DeLeon, Felix | Appellant |
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
Honorable Daniel R Sklar
13113
50 yrs TDCJ