judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00192-CV
08-89-00192-CV
06/02/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Barron, Beatrice
Mabry O'Neal Owen, Ind Exec. the Est. of Rudolph L. Owen dec
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/07/1990Shuck purged
06/07/1990Mandate Issued
06/07/1990Mandate Issued
05/11/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
05/11/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
02/15/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/05/1990Application for Writ of Error
02/05/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
02/05/1990Fee paid
01/03/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/29/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
12/22/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
12/22/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/06/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/06/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/09/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Submission
11/09/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission
07/20/1989Brief Filed
07/20/1989Case ready to be set
07/20/1989Case ready to be set
07/19/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/30/1989Brief Filed
06/30/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
06/22/1989Fee paid
06/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1989Payment of fee due requested
06/02/1989Transcript Filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ross H. Hemphill
UnknownAppellantHon. Philip R. Lane
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Ward
Honorable Bob Parks
88-11-15,649