judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00503-CV
14-89-00503-CV
06/05/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Easterly, Gary D.
Sakowitz, Robert T.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/1989Case stored
10/12/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
09/28/1989Submitted
09/28/1989Submission
09/28/1989Submitted
07/06/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/06/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
07/06/1989Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
07/06/1989Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
06/20/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/08/1989Court's request for a response
06/05/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
06/05/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
06/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/15/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Edward White
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 129th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorKevin H. George
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelator
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
88-045229