Case: 01-89-00535-CR
01-89-00535-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
McKinney, Jack E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/16/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/16/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/21/1990 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
10/24/1990 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
08/10/1990 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
08/07/1990 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
07/27/1990 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
07/13/1990 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
06/28/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/28/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/30/1990 | Submitted | | |
05/30/1990 | Submission | | |
05/30/1990 | Submitted | | |
03/28/1990 | Submission | | |
02/22/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
02/22/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/22/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/15/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/05/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/11/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
01/11/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/28/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/13/1989 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
11/02/1989 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
11/02/1989 | Statement of facts filed | | |
10/24/1989 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
09/29/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
06/02/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/01/1989 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
06/01/1989 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/16/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Walter Boyd |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
506805
Life and a $10,000 fine