Case: 05-94-00775-CV
05-94-00775-CV
05/18/1994
Mandamus
Quality Merchandise, Inc. & Ken Watson, Relators
Gary Hall, Judge, 68th District Court, Dallas County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
08/19/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
08/19/2015 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
06/23/1994 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/23/1994 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/03/1994 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/18/1994 | MattConv | | |||
05/18/1994 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
05/18/1994 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
92-12296-C