judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0801-89
PD-0801-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
HAYES, DARRYL GLEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HAYES, DARRYL GLENApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Ross Teter
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00526-CR
Remanded 3-21-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Larry Baraka
F87-76730-KTI