judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0800-89
PD-0800-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
FARRAR, NORVIL FRANCIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/05/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1989FINAL DISPRefused
07/26/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/05/1989EXPEDITE MOTION TOFiled
07/05/1989RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FARRAR, NORVIL FRANCISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
George White
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00291-CR
Rev & Rem 4-27-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F87-94878-P