Case: 99-1132
99-1132
11/10/1999
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
ARANSAS COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT NO. 1
DOUG NORRELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/2000 | Case Stored | LOCATION 36-B-1 | | |
01/27/2000 | Motion to dismiss disposed | dismissed as moot | | |
01/20/2000 | Motion to dismiss application for writ of error | Aransas County Navigation District No.1; notice of settlement | | |
12/14/1999 | Petition due | Petition is due n/l/t 01/10/2000. | | |
12/14/1999 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petitioner's 2nd m/e/t to file petition for reveiw was granted until 01/10/200 0; petition for review is due n/l/t 01/10/2000 | |
12/10/1999 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | | | |
11/12/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/E/T to file petition for review is granted. Petition is due 12/08/99. | |
11/12/1999 | Petition due | Petition for review is due 12/08/99. | | |
11/10/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 36-B-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ARANSAS COUNTY NAVIDATION DIST | Petitioner | Mr. Russell H. McMains |
NORRELL, DOUG | Respondent | Mr. Wade Thomas Howard |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-97-00380-CV
Aff'd/Rev'd & Remd'd
1 SW3d 296, 08-26-99
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information