judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0792-89
PD-0792-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
HERNANDEZ, ARTHUR J.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HERNANDEZ, ARTHUR J.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Rick Brass
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-01008-CR
Aff 4-6-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable Randy McDonald
8821994