judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0793-89
PD-0793-89
06/05/1989
PDR Case Type
CHAPPELL, WILLIAM WESLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/03/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
11/01/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/12/1989REHEAR FILED
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/03/1989RESPONSE FILED
06/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
Chappell, William WesleyApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael Deegan
Court of Appeals Information:
02-87-00116-CR
Ref & Aff 10-6-88
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable C. C. Cooke
0233865D