Case Heading (S-15-0223) | |||||
Parent: | S-15-0056 | Case Docketed On: | 09/18/2015 | ||
Consolidated: | S-15-0223 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | JAMES DARYL EMERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JAMES DARYL EMERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | James Daryl Emerson | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law, Trial - Post-trial Motions |
Opinion Number: | 2016 WY 44 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
09/18/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
09/18/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
09/18/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/18/2015 | Order - Lifting Stay and Setting Briefing Schedule | Order | Lifting Stay | Final | |
09/18/2015 | Order - Consolidating cases (S-15-0056 & S-15-0223) | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
11/05/2015 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/06/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/23/2015 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/28/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/28/2015 | Event - Phone Call with AG's office, they will file errata to correct brief cover page to include S-15-0056. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
12/28/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Errata | Notice-Incoming | Errata | Final | |
12/29/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Errata | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/11/2016 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
01/12/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/13/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina N. Olson obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/15/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Marc Lloyd Smith obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/19/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
01/19/2016 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II - Original Papers; Volume III - Transcripts; Volume IV - Confidential File; Volume V - Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/19/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
02/17/2016 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justice Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Tina N. Olson obo Appellant; Marc L. Smith obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/15/2016 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/03/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/03/2016 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/03/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/03/2016 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/09/2016 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/5/2016. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |