judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00536-CR
01-89-00536-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Garza, Anthony Jose
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
10/01/1990Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
07/02/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/02/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/06/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/09/1990Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
03/19/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/12/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1989Submitted
12/13/1989Submission
12/13/1989Submitted
10/27/1989Submission
09/28/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/28/1989Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/28/1989Case ready to be set
09/12/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/18/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/25/1989Statement of facts filed
07/25/1989Transcript filed
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/26/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
05/26/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantR. P. Cornelius
StateCriminal - State of TexasDenise Dryer
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT N. BURDETTE
512667
4 yrs TDC