Case Heading (S-13-0243) | |||||
Case Number: | S-13-0243 | Case Docketed On: | 11/12/2013 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | ENRIQUE HERRERA v. ROBERT PHILLIPPS, Individually and as an employee and representative of GILLIGAN'S LLC, a Wyoming Company, and GILLIGAN'S LLC, a Wyoming Company | ||||
Full Title: | ENRIQUE HERRERA, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT PHILLIPPS, Individually and as an employee and representative of GILLIGAN'S LLC, a Wyoming Company, and GILLIGAN'S LLC, a Wyoming Company, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Enrique Herrera | C. John Cotton |
Appellee | Robert Phillipps | Patrick T. Holscher |
Appellee | Gilligan's LLC, a Wyoming Company | Patrick T. Holscher |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Negligence, Workers' Compensation |
Opinion Number: | 2014 WY 118 |
Citation: | 334 P.3d 1225 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/12/2013 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/23/2013 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/26/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/07/2014 | Event - E-filing removed - Brief of Appellee was inadvertently filed without redactions. | Event | E-filing removed | Final | |
02/07/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/10/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Robert Phillipps and GILLIGANS, LLC; and received copy of appellees' designation of record. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/26/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/28/2014 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
03/05/2014 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes (Volumes I-II, pleadings; Volume III, transcripts and exhibits) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/05/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/06/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Patrick T. Holscher obo Robert Phillipps | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/10/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from C. John Cotton obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
04/15/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Additional authority | Notice-Incoming | Additional authority | Final | |
04/17/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional Authority by Appellees Robert Phillips and Gilligans, LLC | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/17/2014 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Burke, Davis and Fox (C. John Cotton obo Appellant; Patrick T. Holscher obo Appellees) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
09/23/2014 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
10/14/2014 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for - undated. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |