judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARDSON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34652
Short Caption:RICHARDSON (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990595Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07441
08/16/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 7, 1999 and June 8, 1999. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-07625
09/07/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: September 14, 1999. 99-08340
09/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08715
09/15/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08716
09/24/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09117
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07737
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09549
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2000. 00-09549