Case Information: 80-CM-0692 | |||
Short Caption: | JAMES, LANCELOT UNITED STATES AND DISTRICT OF | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Lead: | 80-CM-0625 | Consolidated: | 80-CM-0692 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M3707-80 | Filed Date: | 06/02/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/02/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/17/1980 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/26/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/08/1982 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JAMES, LANCELOT aka ANTHONY JAMES LANCELOT UNITED STATES AND DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
06/02/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/17/1980 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/26/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/08/1982 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/17/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |