judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY TODD LAYLAND v. DAVID STEVENS

Case Heading (S-07-0046)
Case Number:S-07-0046Case Docketed On:03/01/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - United States Constitution
Short Title:JEFFREY TODD LAYLAND v. DAVID STEVENS
Full Title:JEFFREY TODD LAYLAND, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAVID STEVENS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey Todd LaylandRobert T. Moxley
AppelleeDavid StevensPatrick J. Crank
Christine Stickley
Thomas W. Rumpke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 188
Citation:171 P.3d 1070 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/17/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/27/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/11/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Notification from district court indicating that designation of entire record filed by counsel for appellant.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
07/10/2007Order - Sanction - designation of record - counsel for appellantOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
07/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert T. MoxleyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Christine Cox.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes, Volumes I - IV, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (amended).Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert T. Moxley for appellant; Christine Gilbert Cox, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/04/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/18/2007Petition - Rehearing; copy of brief on diskPetitionRehearingFinal
12/18/2007Memorandum - In support of petitionMemorandumIn support of petitionFinal
01/08/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal