Case: 05-97-00309-CV
05-97-00309-CV
03/03/1997
Mandamus
TRT Holdings, Inc., TRT Development Company
Marshall, Hon. John
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/19/2016 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
02/29/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
08/13/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
03/05/1997 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/05/1997 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/05/1997 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/05/1997 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/03/1997 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | | |||
03/03/1997 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
03/03/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/19/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Trt Holdings, Inc., Trt Develo | Relator | Robin Clay Hoblit |
Marshall, John | Other | John W. Bickel, Ii |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Bill C. Stephens