Case: 14-97-00236-CV
14-97-00236-CV
03/05/1997
Contract
Indelco Inc. and Chiago Bridge and Iron Company
Hanson Industries North America - Grove Worldwide, Kidde Industries, Inc. d/b/a Grove North America, and G.A.R. International Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/27/1998 | Case stored | | |
10/20/1998 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
10/20/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/20/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/06/1998 | Petition for Review Disposed. | DENIED | |
06/22/1998 | Petition for Review DUE | | |
06/12/1998 | Petition for Review FILED | | |
05/08/1998 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
05/08/1998 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
04/23/1998 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/23/1998 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
03/11/1998 | Submitted | | |
03/11/1998 | Submission | | |
03/11/1998 | Submitted | | |
02/10/1998 | Submission | | |
11/24/1997 | Memorandum of Authorities | | |
04/30/1997 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/30/1997 | Supplemental transcript DUE | | |
04/29/1997 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
04/28/1997 | No description available. | | |
04/17/1997 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
04/07/1997 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
04/04/1997 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/04/1997 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/04/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/04/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/26/1997 | Record due | | |
03/26/1997 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
03/05/1997 | Transcript FILED | | |
03/05/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/28/1997 | Bond FILED | | |
12/04/1996 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
11/26/1996 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
INDELCO INC. AND CHIAGO BRIDGE | Appellant | John D. Charbonnet, Jr. Rick Lee Oldenettel |
GROVE NORTH AMERICA, DIVISION | Appellee | Daniel O. Goforth Jack Edward Little, Jr. |
HANSON INDUSTRIES NORTH AMERIC | Appellee | Nathan Montgomery Rymer |
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable DON WITTIG
95-41543