Case: 04-97-00163-CR
04-97-00163-CR
03/05/1997
Burglary
Robert Sanders
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/09/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/15/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/15/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
09/11/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/11/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/11/1997 | Order Entered | Abated | |
09/11/1997 | Motion to Abate Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/11/1997 | Order Entered | Abated | |
08/22/1997 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/21/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
08/21/1997 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
08/21/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/21/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/18/1997 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/25/1997 | Motion to Abate Filed | | |
07/25/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
07/25/1997 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
07/24/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/24/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/24/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/24/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
07/07/1997 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/26/1997 | Order Entered | | |
06/26/1997 | Motion to Consolidate Cases Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/25/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
06/16/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
06/16/1997 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/16/1997 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
06/16/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
06/16/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
06/16/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
06/04/1997 | Show cause hearing held | | |
05/20/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
05/20/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
04/23/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
04/23/1997 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
04/23/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
04/23/1997 | Exhibits Filed | | |
03/27/1997 | Order Entered | | |
03/18/1997 | Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed | | |
03/07/1997 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
03/05/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/26/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/31/1997 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
01/27/1997 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/11/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robert Sanders | Criminal - Appellant | Alan Warrick |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Raymond Angelini Alan E. Battaglia Kathy Granados Pattie Garces |
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raymond Angelini
96-CR-1981
7 Years & $1,000 Fine.