Case: 02-97-00056-CV
02-97-00056-CV
02/28/1997
Mandamus
Pioneer Mobile Home Service, Inc.
Hon. Robert McCoy, Judge, 48th District Court, Tarrant County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/20/2009 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
05/12/1997 | Case stored | | |
04/10/1997 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/10/1997 | Submitted | | |
03/10/1997 | Submission | | |
03/07/1997 | Response Filed | | |
03/05/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/05/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/05/1997 | Petition for Original Proceeding | | |
02/28/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
02/28/1997 | Motion to File | | |
02/28/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/20/2009 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Golden, Joe And Betty | Real party in interest | Jenks Garrett |
Pioneer Mobile Home Service, I | Appellant | John B. Kronenberger |
Hon. Robert Mccoy, Judge, 48Th | Appellee | Hon. Robert McCoy, 48th District Court |
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Bonnie Sudderth
48-159935-95